ME LD884 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restrict the Collection of Surveillance Video, Information and Data Regarding Lawful Firearm Purchases
Title
An Act To Restrict the Collection of Surveillance Video, Information and Data Regarding Lawful Firearm Purchases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #339 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-120). |
2021-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-120) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-120) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-120) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 339 Yeas 17 - Nays 18 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |