ME LD883 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Endangered Species Whose Life Cycles Include Maine Land or Waters
Title
An Act To Protect Endangered Species Whose Life Cycles Include Maine Land or Waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative McCREIGHT of Harpswell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2021-04-28 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-03-11 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Bill was REFERRED to the Committees on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE AND MARINE RESOURCES |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=883&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0298&item=1&snum=130 |