ME LD873 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Continue the Department of Education Diploma Program Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic
Title
An Act to Continue the Department of Education Diploma Program Related to the COVID-19 Pandemic
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-06-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-142). |
2023-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-142). |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |