ME LD860 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-16 - Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Adjust Reimbursement Rates for Dental Services under the MaineCare Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Department of Health and Human Services To Adjust Reimbursement Rates for Dental Services under the MaineCare Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-16HouseCarried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555.
2015-06-30SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555.
2015-06-15SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
2015-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-12HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2015-06-10HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-06-10HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-235).
2015-06-10HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2015-06-10HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-235) was READ and ADOPTED.
2015-06-10HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2015-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2015-06-10HouseReports READ.
2015-06-10SenateReports READ On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-235) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-235) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-03-11HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2015-03-11HouseResolve REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2015-03-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2015-03-11SenateOn motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2015-03-11Senatesuggested and ordered printed
2015-03-11SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback