ME LD86 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Sales to Area Agencies on Aging Tax-exempt
Title
An Act To Make Sales to Area Agencies on Aging Tax-exempt
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-28), in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-28) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-28). |
2021-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |