ME LD859 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Ethics and Transparency in Government Service
Title
An Act To Increase Ethics and Transparency in Government Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-423), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-423) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Report READ. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-423) |
2013-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Tuttle of York, REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |