ME LD858 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Require the State to Invest in Federal Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Require the State to Invest in Federal Certified Community Behavioral Health Clinics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-02SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-04-28JointReported Out: LTW
2023-04-27JointLTW Approved by Chairs
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2023-02-28SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback