ME LD857 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Validate Certain Proceedings Authorizing the Issuance of Bonds and Notes by School Administrative District No. 32
Title
An Act To Validate Certain Proceedings Authorizing the Issuance of Bonds and Notes by School Administrative District No. 32
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Roger Sherman [R] | Rep. Patricia Sutherland [D] |
Rep. Charles Theriault [D] | Sen. Michael Willette [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-04-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-02 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-04-02 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-03-31 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-26 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-03-26 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |