ME LD851 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Women Are Informed of Abortion Pill Reversal
Title
An Act To Ensure Women Are Informed of Abortion Pill Reversal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #422 (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #343 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #343 (Y: 80 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 422 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 343 (Yeas 80 - Nays 63 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-17 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-06-09 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed. |