ME LD837 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Operations of State Government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide Supplemental Appropriations and Allocations for the Operations of State Government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #698 (Y: 85 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Adopt Scs-502 To Cah-751 RC #681 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #680 (Y: 11 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-06-19 - House - Adopt Hah-798 To Cah-751 RC #669 (Y: 78 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #668 (Y: 78 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-09HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-07-09HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-07-09HouseROLL CALL NO. 698V 85 having voted in the affirmative and 58 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2018-07-09HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-06-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-06-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-06-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto.
2018-06-20SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-06-20SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-751) as Amended by Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 681 Yeas 23 - Nays 9 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2018-06-20SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland Senate Amendment "C" (S-502) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-06-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-751) READ
2018-06-20SenateREAD ONCE
2018-06-20SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) Report ACCEPTED
2018-06-20SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 680 Yeas 11 - Nays 21 - Excused 3 - Absent 0
2018-06-20SenateMotion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford moved the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
2018-06-20SenateReports Read
2018-06-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-06-19HouseSubsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-798) thereto.
2018-06-19HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-06-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-751) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-798) thereto was ADOPTED.
2018-06-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 669 (Yeas 78 - Nays 58 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
2018-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, House Amendment "A" (H-798) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-751) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-06-19HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-751) was READ.
2018-06-19HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-06-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 668 (Yeas 78 - Nays 56 - Absent 17 - Excused 0)
2018-06-19HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-06-19HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2018-05-02HouseCarried over to any special session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
2018-04-19HouseUnfinished Business
2018-04-17HouseUnfinished Business
2018-04-13HouseUnfinished Business
2018-04-13HouseLater today assigned.
2018-04-13HouseOn motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2018-04-13HouseReports READ.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-03-07SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-03-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-07HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
2017-03-07HouseCommittee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=837&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0586&item=15&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280063763&chamber=House&serialnumber=668
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280063763&chamber=House&serialnumber=669
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280063763&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=680
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280063763&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=681
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280063763&chamber=House&serialnumber=698

Bill Comments

feedback