ME LD831 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Base the Minimum Wage on a New England State Average and To Restore the Tip Credit
Title
An Act To Base the Minimum Wage on a New England State Average and To Restore the Tip Credit
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Rep. Gary Hilliard [R] |
Rep. Karleton Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - Senate - Insist RC #325 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #304 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #304 (Y: 79 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-210) |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending On motion by Same Senator to INSIST |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-210) |
2017-06-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-13 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2017-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 304 (Yeas 79 - Nays 67 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-13 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-13 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-06-13 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-210) |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-210) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-07 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed |