ME LD831 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Reduce MaineCare Spending through Targeted Prevention Services
Title
Resolve, To Reduce MaineCare Spending through Targeted Prevention Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) thereto |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-326) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) READ and ADOPTED |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) was ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. |
2015-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-281), in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-281) |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |