ME LD816 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President of the United States

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Implement the National Popular Vote for President of the United States

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Recede And Concur RC #310 (Y: 69 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Enactment RC #343 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - Enactment RC #277 (Y: 68 N: 79 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur RC #228 (Y: 73 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur RC #230 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Insist RC #229 (Y: 70 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #245 (Y: 14 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - House - Reconsider RC #161 (Y: 48 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - House - Acc Min Otp As Amended Rep RC #160 (Y: 66 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #94 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2019-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To PASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-19HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-19HouseThe House INSISTED on FAILING of PASSAGE to be ENACTED.
2019-06-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 310 (Yeas 69 - Nays 74 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
2019-06-19HouseMotion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED.
2019-06-19SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-19SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 343 Yeas 18 - Nays 16 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-06-19SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-06-18HouseRELEASED.
2019-06-17HouseHELD at the Request of Representative MOONEN of Portland.
2019-06-17HouseROLL CALL NO. 277 (Yeas 68 - Nays 79 - Absent 3 - Excused 1)
2019-06-17HousePASSAGE TO BE ENACTED FAILED.
2019-06-13HouseRELEASED.
2019-06-12HouseHELD at the Request of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle.
2019-06-12HouseHELD.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 230 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 4 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-06-12HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44).
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 229 (Yeas 70 - Nays 76 - Absent 4 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-06-12HouseMotion of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle, to INSIST FAILED.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 228 (Yeas 73 - Nays 73 - Absent 4 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-06-12HouseMotion to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED.
2019-06-11SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-06-11SenateRELEASED.
2019-06-10SenateHELD at the Request of Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin.
2019-06-10SenateSubsequently The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-44)
2019-06-10SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 245 Yeas 14 - Nays 21 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-10SenateSenator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin moved to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED
2019-06-10SenateSenator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to INSIST
2019-06-10SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-05-30HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 161 (Yeas 48 - Nays 84 - Absent 16 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, the motion to RECONSIDER FAILED.
2019-05-30HouseRepresentative BABBIDGE of Kennebunk moved that the House RECONSIDER its action whereby the the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 160 (Yeas 66 - Nays 76 - Absent 6 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2019-05-30HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-29HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-21HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-16HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-16HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-16HouseOn further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16HouseRepresentative SCHNECK of Bangor moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16HouseReports READ.
2019-05-14SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-14SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-44)
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-44) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-14SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-14SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 94 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-14SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-14SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-09SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-08SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-02SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-30SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-25SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-23SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-18SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-16SenateUnfinished Business
2019-04-16SenateOn motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of either Report
2019-02-14HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-14HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-02-14SenateCommittee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=816&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0252&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0252&item=2&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=94
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=160
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=161
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=245
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=229
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=230
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=228
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=277
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=343
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280071841&chamber=House&serialnumber=310

Bill Comments

feedback