ME LD805 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Laws Governing Taste Testing and Retail Sales of Liquor at Farmers' Markets and To Allow Retail Sales at Other Taste-testing Events
Title
An Act To Clarify the Laws Governing Taste Testing and Retail Sales of Liquor at Farmers' Markets and To Allow Retail Sales at Other Taste-testing Events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-248). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-02-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |