ME LD801 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow a Physical Therapist To Administer Certain Coagulation Tests in a Patient's Home
Title
An Act To Allow a Physical Therapist To Administer Certain Coagulation Tests in a Patient's Home
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-18 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-136) in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-136) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-136). |
2017-05-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-11 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |