ME LD800 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Mandatory Law Enforcement Agency Policies Regarding Recording Suspects To Include Cases of Murder and Class A, Class B and Class C Crimes
Title
An Act To Amend Mandatory Law Enforcement Agency Policies Regarding Recording Suspects To Include Cases of Murder and Class A, Class B and Class C Crimes
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #289 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-572) in concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-572) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 289 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-572). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-572) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Carpenter of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2019-02-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-12 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-02-12 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |