ME LD799 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Stimulate the Economy and Invigorate the Hunting Industry by Establishing a Pilot Project To Allow Hunting on Sundays in Limited Areas
Title
An Act To Stimulate the Economy and Invigorate the Hunting Industry by Establishing a Pilot Project To Allow Hunting on Sundays in Limited Areas
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Chace [R] | Sen. James Hamper [R] | Rep. Robert Duchesne [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Rep. Joel Stetkis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-04-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-23 | House | On motion of Representative SHAW of Standish, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-23 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=799&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0548&item=1&snum=127 |