ME LD795 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-9-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Unfinished Business
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to Food

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish a Right to Food

Sponsors

Rep. Craig Hickman [D]Rep. Kent Ackley [I]Rep. Robert Alley [D]Rep. Betty Austin [D]
Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D]Rep. Shawn Babine [D]Rep. Donna Bailey [D]Rep. Pinny Beebe-Center [D]
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D]Rep. Seth Berry [D]Sen. Russell Black [R]Sen. Catherine Breen [D]
Rep. Heidi Brooks [D]Rep. Mark Bryant [D]Rep. Barbara Cardone [D]Sen. Michael Carpenter [D]
Sen. Everett Carson [D]Rep. Richard Cebra [R]Sen. Justin Chenette [D]Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D]
Sen. Ned Claxton [D]Rep. Benjamin Collings [D]Rep. Janice Cooper [D]Rep. Margaret Craven [D]
Rep. Edward Crockett [D]Rep. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D]Rep. Diane Denk [D]Rep. Janice Dodge [D]
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D]Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D]Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I]Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D]
Rep. William Faulkingham [R]Rep. Jessica Fay [D]Rep. Justin Fecteau [R]Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D]
Rep. Victoria Foley [D]Rep. Andrew Gattine [D]Rep. Lori Gramlich [D]Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D]
Rep. James Handy [D]Rep. Thomas Harnett [D]Rep. Allison Hepler [D]Sen. Erin Herbig [D]
Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D]Rep. Brian Hubbell [D]Rep. Henry Ingwersen [D]Sen. Troy Jackson [D]
Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D]Rep. Christopher Kessler [D]Rep. Scott Landry [D]Sen. Nathan Libby [D]
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D]Rep. Donald Marean [R]Rep. John Martin [D]Rep. Roland Martin [D]
Rep. Ann Matlack [D]Rep. David McCrea [D]Rep. Joyce McCreight [D]Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D]
Rep. Michele Meyer [D]Sen. David Miramant [D]Rep. Matthew Moonen [D]Rep. Victoria Morales [D]
Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D]Rep. Beth O'Connor [R]Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D]Rep. Lester Ordway [R]
Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D]Rep. Anne Perry [D]Rep. Teresa Pierce [D]Rep. William Pluecker [I]
Rep. Walter Riseman [I]Sen. Heather Sanborn [D]Rep. Braden Sharpe [D]Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R]
Rep. Stephen Stanley [D]Rep. Michael Sylvester [D]Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D]Rep. Denise Tepler [D]
Rep. Maureen Terry [D]Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D]Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D]Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R]
Rep. Charlotte Warren [D]Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #193 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #176 (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-26HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-18HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-17HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-17HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-17HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-17SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-430) AND House Amendment "A" (H-541) in concurrence
2019-06-17SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-13SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-13SenateSenator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR AND Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-06-12HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-06-12HouseSubsequently, the RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-430) and House Amendment "A" (H-541).
2019-06-12HouseOn further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-541) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-12HouseSubsequently, On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
2019-06-12HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-06-11HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-07HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-06HouseUnfinished Business
2019-06-06HouseLater today assigned.
2019-06-06HouseOn motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-06-05SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-430) in concurrence
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-430) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-05SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-05SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 193 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-05SenateOn motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05SenateReports Read
2019-06-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-04HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-430).
2019-06-04HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-04HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-430) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-04HouseThe RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
2019-06-04HouseROLL CALL NO. 176 (Yeas 93 - Nays 47 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-04HouseOn motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-04HouseReports READ.
2019-02-12SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
2019-02-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-12HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2019-02-12HouseCommittee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback