ME LD785 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Educate the Public on the Proper Use of Pesticides and To Promote Integrated Pest Management
Title
Resolve, Directing the Board of Pesticides Control To Educate the Public on the Proper Use of Pesticides and To Promote Integrated Pest Management
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Black [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D] | Rep. Randall Hall [R] |
Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Resolve and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Resolve and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=785&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0229&item=1&snum=129 |