ME LD784 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Prevent Tax Haven Abuse
Title
An Act To Prevent Tax Haven Abuse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #250 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #186 (Y: 74 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #186 (Y: 74 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-08 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-169). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 250 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator DOW of Lincoln to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senator DOW of Lincoln moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-169). |
2017-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-169) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 186 (Yeas 74 - Nays 67 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-31 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-17 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-17 | House | Representative TIPPING of Orono moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |