ME LD768 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Department of Economic and Community Development and a Representative from the Office of the Governor To Study the Softwood Pulp Industry
Title
Resolve, Directing the Department of Economic and Community Development and a Representative from the Office of the Governor To Study the Softwood Pulp Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-261), in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-261) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-261). |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-02 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-28 | Senate | REFERENCED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS |
2021-04-28 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Representative O'NEIL from the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Reported Out: REFERRED TO IDEA |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Referred To: IDEA |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Voted: REFERRED |
2021-04-08 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |