ME LD761 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Access to Hearing Aids
Title
An Act To Increase Access to Hearing Aids
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Herbig [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D] |
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Jennifer Parker [D] | Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-403), in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403). |
2017-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |