ME LD754 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on June 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage Transparency in the Disclosing of the Ingredients in Vaccinations for Children
Title
An Act To Encourage Transparency in the Disclosing of the Ingredients in Vaccinations for Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #122 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #144 (Y: 62 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-05-29 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #144 (Y: 62 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate ADHERED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-03 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED and ASKED for a COMMITTEE OF CONFERENCE. |
2013-06-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-31 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-31 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-05-30 | Senate | (25 -Yeas, 9 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Roll Call Number 122 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-29 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-05-29 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-29 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-29 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Minority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 144 (Yeas 62 - Nays 81 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-29 | House | On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence. |
2013-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |