ME LD753 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Allow Retired Teachers and Educational Technicians to Be Recertified

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Allow Retired Teachers and Educational Technicians to Be Recertified

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-25SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2023-07-25SenateOn Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2023-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-08HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-06HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-06HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-152).
2023-06-06HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-06-06HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-06-01SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2023-06-01SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-152).
2023-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-152) READ and ADOPTED.
2023-06-01SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-06-01SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2023-05-31JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-05-03JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-05-03JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-02-16HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-02-16HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2023-02-16SenateCommittee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback