ME LD750 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide $500,000 of Matching Funds over 4 Years through Appropriations and Allocations To Preserve Rural Heritage and Living History Pertaining to Science and Technology in Penobscot and York Counties
Title
An Act To Provide $500,000 of Matching Funds over 4 Years through Appropriations and Allocations To Preserve Rural Heritage and Living History Pertaining to Science and Technology in Penobscot and York Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-04-20 | House | RELEASED. |
2017-04-19 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester. |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2017-04-19 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-03-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=750&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0530&item=1&snum=128 |