ME LD737 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Value of Property Exempt from Attachment and Execution
Title
An Act To Increase the Value of Property Exempt from Attachment and Execution
Sponsors
Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Sen. Donna Bailey [D] | Rep. Heidi Brooks [D] | Sen. Anne Carney [D] |
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Kristi Mathieson [D] | Sen. Heather Sanborn [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) in concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-589). |
2021-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Bill was REFERRED to the Committees on JUDICIARY In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |