ME LD735 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Voluntary Preforeclosure Mediation Program
Title
An Act To Establish a Voluntary Preforeclosure Mediation Program
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Valentino [D] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] |
Rep. Raymond Wallace [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY , in concurrence. |
2015-03-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-03-11 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-03-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-10 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-10 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative BECK of Waterville, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence. |
2015-03-10 | House | READ. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator Whittemore of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2015-03-05 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=735&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0265&item=1&snum=127 |