ME LD732 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Refund 50 Percent of 2020 State Liquor Licensing Fees to Nonprofit Organizations
Title
An Act To Refund 50 Percent of 2020 State Liquor Licensing Fees to Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=732&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0284&item=1&snum=130 |