ME LD728 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Reported Out: ONTP
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Reported Out: ONTP
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing State Agencies That Maintain Public Lands for Recreation To Make Certain Information Readily Accessible to the General Public
Title
Resolve, Directing State Agencies That Maintain Public Lands for Recreation To Make Certain Information Readily Accessible to the General Public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 3, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=728&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0279&item=1&snum=130 |