ME LD718 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-38-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - RELEASED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Maine Food Consumers' Right To Know about Genetically Engineered Food

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Maine Food Consumers' Right To Know about Genetically Engineered Food

Sponsors

Rep. Lance Harvell [R]Sen. Emily Cain [D]Sen. Justin Alfond [D]Sen. James Boyle [D]
Sen. Ronald Collins [R]Sen. Margaret Craven [D]Sen. David Dutremble [D]Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D]
Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D]Sen. James Hamper [?]Sen. Anne Haskell [D]Sen. Dawn Hill [D]
Sen. Troy Jackson [D]Sen. Christopher Johnson [D]Sen. Colleen Lachowicz [D]Sen. Brian Langley [R]
Sen. Edward Mazurek [D]Sen. Rebecca Millett [D]Sen. John Patrick [D]Sen. Gary Plummer [R]
Sen. John Tuttle [D]Sen. Rodney Whittemore [R]Rep. Bear [?]Rep. Paulette Beaudoin [D]
Rep. Michael Beaulieu [R]Rep. Henry Beck [D]Rep. Paul Bennett [R]Rep. Andrea Boland [D]
Rep. Sheryl Briggs [D]Rep. Joseph Brooks [?]Rep. James Campbell [R]Rep. Michael Carey [D]
Rep. Alan Casavant [D]Rep. Ralph Chapman [D]Rep. Kathleen Chase [R]Rep. David Cotta [R]
Rep. Dale Crafts [R]Rep. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D]Sen. Paul Davis [R]Rep. Elizabeth Dickerson [D]
Rep. Mark Dion [D]Rep. Peter Doak [R]Rep. Larry Dunphy [R]Rep. Eleanor Espling [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I]Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D]Rep. Lori Fowle [D]Rep. Sara Gideon [D]
Rep. Paul Gilbert [D]Rep. James Gillway [R]Rep. Adam Goode [D]Rep. Anne Graham [D]
Rep. Gay Grant [D]Rep. Stacey Guerin [R]Rep. Scott Hamann [D]Rep. Charles Harlow [D]
Rep. Craig Hickman [D]Rep. Barry Hobbins [D]Rep. Brian Hubbell [D]Rep. Peter Johnson [R]
Rep. Brian Jones [D]Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D]Rep. Peter Kent [D]Rep. Dennis Keschl [R]
Rep. Jonathan Kinney [R]Rep. Gary Knight [R]Rep. Charles Kruger [D]Rep. Walter Kumiega [D]
Rep. Karen Kusiak [D]Rep. Michael Lajoie [D]Sen. Nathan Libby [D]Rep. Thomas Longstaff [D]
Rep. Sharri Macdonald [R]Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D]Rep. Joyce Maker [R]Rep. Richard Malaby [R]
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D]Rep. Jeffrey Mccabe [D]Rep. Michael Mcclellan [R]Rep. Paul McGowan [D]
Rep. Andrew McLean [D]Rep. Kimberly Monaghan-Derrig [D]Rep. Matthew Moonen [D]Rep. Stephen Moriarty [D]
Rep. Terry Morrison [D]Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D]Rep. Mary Nelson [D]Rep. Melvin Newendyke [R]
Rep. Wayne Parry [R]Rep. Anita Peavey Haskell [R]Rep. Ann Peoples [D]Rep. Matthew Peterson [D]
Rep. Joshua Plante [D]Rep. Matthew Pouliot [R]Rep. Christine Powers [D]Rep. Helen Rankin [D]
Rep. Roger Reed [R]Rep. Megan Rochelo [D]Rep. Diane Russell [D]Rep. Deane Rykerson [D]
Rep. Linda Sanborn [D]Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R]Rep. John Schneck [D]Rep. Michael Shaw [D]
Rep. Stanley Short [D]Rep. Heather Sirocki [R]Rep. Soctomah [?]Rep. Stephen Stanley [D]
Rep. Peter Stuckey [D]Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D]Rep. Sharon Treat [D]Rep. Beth Turner [R]
Rep. Thomas Tyler [R]Rep. Lisa Villa [D]Sen. Amy Volk [R]Rep. Wallace Dexter [?]
Rep. Windol Weaver [R]Rep. Joan Welsh [D]Rep. Russell Werts [D]Rep. Corey Wilson [R]
Rep. Ellen Winchenbach [R]

Roll Calls

2013-06-12 - Adopt Hb To Ca RC #255 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Reconsider RC #254 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #253 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Adopt H B H-444 To C A 393 RC #276 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateRELEASED
2013-06-27SenateHELD at the Request of Senator CUSHING of Penobscot.
2013-06-27SenateTAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
2013-06-13SenateOn motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
2013-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-06-12HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2013-06-12SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2013-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-444) thereto, in concurrence.
2013-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-393) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-444) thereto ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2013-06-12SenatePREVAILED
2013-06-12Senate(35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
2013-06-12SenateRoll Call Number 255
2013-06-12SenateHouse Amendment "B" (H-444) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
2013-06-12SenatePREVAILED
2013-06-12Senate(35 -Yeas, 0 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
2013-06-12SenateRoll Call Number 254
2013-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-393). (Roll Call Ordered)
2013-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-393) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2013-06-12SenateREAD ONCE.
2013-06-12SenatePREVAILED
2013-06-12Senate(31 -Yeas, 4 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
2013-06-12SenateRoll Call Number 253
2013-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Report "A" Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
2013-06-12SenateReports READ.
2013-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-06-11HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-444) thereto.
2013-06-11HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2013-06-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-393) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-444) thereto ADOPTED.
2013-06-11HouseROLL CALL NO. 276 (Yeas 141 - Nays 4 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
2013-06-11HouseOn motion of Representative TIMBERLAKE of Turner, House Amendment "B" (H-444) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-393) was READ and ADOPTED.
2013-06-11HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-393) was READ.
2013-06-11HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2013-06-11HouseOn motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2013-06-11HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2013-06-10HouseUnfinished Business
2013-06-10HouseLater today assigned.
2013-06-10HouseOn motion of Representative DILL of Old Town TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report.
2013-06-10HouseReports READ.
2013-03-07HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-03-07HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
2013-03-05SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2013-03-05SenateOn motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2013-03-05SenateTAKEN from the Table by the President.
2013-02-28Senate(Unfinished Business)
2013-02-26Senate(Unfinished Business)
2013-02-26SenateOn motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence.
2013-02-26HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-02-26HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2013-02-26HouseCommittee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=718&snum=126
Texthttp://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0490&item=1&snum=126
Texthttp://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0490&item=2&snum=126
Texthttp://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0490&item=10&snum=126
Texthttp://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0490&item=11&snum=126
Roll Callhttp://www.mainelegislature.org/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280047295&chamber=House&serialnumber=276
Roll Callhttp://www.mainelegislature.org/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280047295&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=253
Roll Callhttp://www.mainelegislature.org/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280047295&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=254
Roll Callhttp://www.mainelegislature.org/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280047295&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=255

Bill Comments

feedback