ME LD716 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Requirements for Reporting to the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices
Title
An Act To Improve Requirements for Reporting to the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Parry [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] | Sen. William Diamond [D] |
Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Rep. Michael Devin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Insist RC #131 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Insist RC #82 (Y: 77 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Recede And Concur RC #81 (Y: 74 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #36 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Insist RC #82 (Y: 77 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - Recede And Concur RC #81 (Y: 74 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #36 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 131 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY SENATE AMENDMENT "B" (S-57) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 82 (Yeas 77 - Nays 72 - Absent 1 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-11 | House | Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-05-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 81 (Yeas 74 - Nays 75 - Absent 1 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-11 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-57) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Senate Amendment "B" (S-57) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules READ A SECOND TIME |
2017-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senator MASON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought to Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 36 (Yeas 72 - Nays 71 - Absent 7 - Excused 1) |
2017-04-18 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |