ME LD703 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Amount to Which a State Employee or Teacher Retiree's Cost-of-living Adjustment Is Applied from $20,000 to the Retiree's Actual Retirement Benefit
Title
An Act To Increase the Amount to Which a State Employee or Teacher Retiree's Cost-of-living Adjustment Is Applied from $20,000 to the Retiree's Actual Retirement Benefit
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Rep. Danny Costain [R] | Rep. Daniel Newman [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] |
Rep. William Tuell [R] | Rep. Joseph Underwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) in concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-200). |
2021-06-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-200) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-02 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-05-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-02 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 2, 2021. |