ME LD703 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Address Marine Debris Resulting from Commercial Activities
Title
An Act To Address Marine Debris Resulting from Commercial Activities
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Devin [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Lydia Blume [D] |
Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Rep. James Gillway [R] | Rep. Walter Kumiega [D] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAKER of Washington the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-01 | House | On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=703&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0494&item=1&snum=128 |