ME LD699 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enact the Toxic Chemicals in the Workplace Act
Title
An Act To Enact the Toxic Chemicals in the Workplace Act
Sponsors
Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] |
Rep. Robert Alley [D] | Rep. Dillon Bates [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #103 (Y: 77 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-23 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-18 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135). |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-135). |
2017-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-135) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 103 (Yeas 77 - Nays 69 - Absent 3 - Excused 2) |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |