ME LD687 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create a Flag To Recognize the Bicentennial of the State
Title
Resolve, To Create a Flag To Recognize the Bicentennial of the State
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Cooper [D] | Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Rep. Betty Austin [D] | Rep. Donna Doore [D] |
Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Deane Rykerson [D] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #45 (Y: 85 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Table Until Later RC #44 (Y: 30 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-04-11 - House - Table Until Later RC #44 (Y: 30 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-18 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-72) in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ and ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-72) in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-72). |
2019-04-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-72) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 45 (Yeas 85 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-11 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 44 (Yeas 30 - Nays 111 - Absent 8 - Excused 1 Vacant 1) |
2019-04-11 | House | Motion of Representative RISEMAN of Harrison, to TABLE pending the motion of Representative BRYANT of Windham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED. |
2019-04-11 | House | Representative BRYANT of Windham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2019-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |