ME LD681 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish a Task Force To Study Safe and Stable Housing in Lodging Facilities
Title
Resolve, To Establish a Task Force To Study Safe and Stable Housing in Lodging Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-155). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-155). |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-155) READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-13 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |