ME LD681 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Regarding Sexual Activity and Sexual Assault at Secondary and Postsecondary Educational Institutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Regarding Sexual Activity and Sexual Assault at Secondary and Postsecondary Educational Institutions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
2017-06-19SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2017-06-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-16HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-16SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-505) in concurrence
2017-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-505) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-16SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-16SenateOn motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-16SenateReports Read
2017-06-15HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-505).
2017-06-15HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-15HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-505) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-15HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-15HouseOn motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-15HouseReports READ.
2017-02-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2017-02-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-02-28HouseCommittee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback