ME LD681 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Operation of the Maine Commission for Community Service
Title
An Act To Clarify the Operation of the Maine Commission for Community Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-05-19 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator THOMAS of Somerset Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) On motion of Representative COTTA of China, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on February 17, 2011. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=681&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0508&item=1&snum=125 |