ME LD681 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on April 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Summary
An Act To Lower the Cost of State Government in the Departments under the Purview of the Joint Standing Committee on State and Local Government
Title
An Act To Lower the Cost of State Government in the Departments under the Purview of the Joint Standing Committee on State and Local Government
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Rep. Henry Joy [R] | Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Rep. Sarah Lewin [R] |
Sen. John Nutting [D] | Rep. Lawrence Sirois [D] | Sen. David Trahan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | (H) Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | |
2009-04-09 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 19 (Yeas 87 - Nays 53 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) | |
2009-04-09 | (H) On motion of Representative BEAUDETTE of Biddeford, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-04-08 | (S) On motion by Senator SIMPSON of Androscoggin Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED (Remarks Made) Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 45 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2009-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Senator SIMPSON of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Majority Ought Not To Pass Report | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-02-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-02-24 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-02-24 | (S) On motion by Senator Simpson of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-02-24 | (S) Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |