ME LD675 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine Consumers from Unsupported Price Increases on Prescription Medicines
Title
An Act To Protect Maine Consumers from Unsupported Price Increases on Prescription Medicines
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] | Sen. Stacy Brenner [D] | Sen. Glenn Curry [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] |
Sen. Louis Luchini [D] | Sen. Chloe Maxmin [D] | Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] | Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-07-19 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #505 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #322 (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-b RC #373 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #322 (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-b RC #373 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | LD 675 In Senate, July 19, 2021, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 and 14, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290). |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 322 (Yeas 81 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 373 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-290) Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 2, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |