ME LD669 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - RELEASED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Address the Unmet Workforce Needs of Employers and To Improve the Economic Future of Workers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Address the Unmet Workforce Needs of Employers and To Improve the Economic Future of Workers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #624 (Y: 97 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #637 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseRELEASED.
2018-04-18HouseHELD at the Request of Representative SEAVEY of Kennebunkport.
2018-04-18HousePlaced in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
2018-04-18HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-18HouseROLL CALL NO. 624V 97 having voted in the affirmative and 51 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
2018-04-18HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2018-04-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-04-17SenateLD 669 In Senate, April 17, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 34 IN FAVOR and 1 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2018-04-03SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-02HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-03-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-28HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-399).
2018-03-28HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2018-03-28HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2018-03-27SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2018-03-27SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-399).
2018-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-399) READ and ADOPTED.
2018-03-27SenateREAD ONCE.
2018-03-27SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
2017-02-28SenateCommittee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback