ME LD663 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Holders of Gold Star Family Registration Plates To Be Issued Complimentary Licenses To Hunt, Trap and Fish and To Exempt Them from Vehicle Registration Fees
Title
An Act To Allow Holders of Gold Star Family Registration Plates To Be Issued Complimentary Licenses To Hunt, Trap and Fish and To Exempt Them from Vehicle Registration Fees
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Fecteau [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Rep. William Faulkingham [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Rep. Roland Martin [D] | Rep. Scott Strom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED |
2019-02-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-21 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-02-21 | House | On further motion of same Representative the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2019-02-21 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Augusta, the House RECEDED. |
2019-02-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2019-02-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2019-02-14 | House | Later today assigned. |
2019-02-14 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2019-02-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-07 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2019-02-07 | House | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=663&snum=129 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0484&item=1&snum=129 |