ME LD637 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Promote the Use of Free Annual Wellness Visits by Ensuring Proper Disclosure
Title
An Act to Promote the Use of Free Annual Wellness Visits by Ensuring Proper Disclosure
Sponsors
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Poppy Arford [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Marc Malon [D] |
Rep. Daniel Shagoury [D] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-70), in concurrence. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-70) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-05-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator RENY of Lincoln the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-70). |
2023-04-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-70) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-04-27 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-04-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-02-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-02-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-02-14 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |