ME LD634 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Permits for Final Disposition of Dead Human Bodies
Title
An Act Regarding Permits for Final Disposition of Dead Human Bodies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-03-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2013-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-02-21 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |