ME LD632 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate the Conversion of Children's Private Nonmedical Institutions to Qualified Residential Treatment Programs as Required by Federal Law
Title
An Act To Facilitate the Conversion of Children's Private Nonmedical Institutions to Qualified Residential Treatment Programs as Required by Federal Law
Sponsors
Sen. Ned Claxton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-23 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on March 1, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |