ME LD629 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Task Force To Study the Process for Bringing Criminal Cases in Situations of Violence against Health Care Workers
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Task Force To Study the Process for Bringing Criminal Cases in Situations of Violence against Health Care Workers
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Riseman [I] | Rep. Kyle Bailey [D] | Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Sophia Warren [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-25 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-645) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-645) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-645) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-645) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-311), in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-311) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-311). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-25 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 25, 2021. |