ME LD626 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Develop Recommendations Regarding Nonwater-dependent Floating Structures on Maine's Waters
Title
Resolve, To Direct the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry To Develop Recommendations Regarding Nonwater-dependent Floating Structures on Maine's Waters
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Rep. Jessica Fay [D] |
Rep. Scott Landry [D] | Rep. John Martin [D] | Rep. Lester Ordway [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-803), in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-803) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-03-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-803). |
2022-03-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2022-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2022-03-08 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-01-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Reports READ and ACCEPTED |
2022-01-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-01-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY |
2022-01-26 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2022-01-26 | Joint | Referred To: ACF |
2022-01-26 | House | Representative LANDRY from the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Reporting that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2022-01-25 | Joint | Reported Out: REF TO ACF |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-15 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-02-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-02-25 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on February 25, 2021. |