ME LD62 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Enhance the Senior Volunteer Benefit Program
Title
An Act To Enhance the Senior Volunteer Benefit Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith |
2019-04-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-03-26 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-03-26 | House | On motion of Representative TIPPING of Orono, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-26 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-01-15 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |