ME LD612 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Vocational Rehabilitation under the Maine Workers' Compensation Act of 1992
Title
An Act To Improve Vocational Rehabilitation under the Maine Workers' Compensation Act of 1992
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Rep. James Handy [D] |
Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-44), in concurrence. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-44) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-44). |
2017-04-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-04-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-02-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |