ME LD611 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Exempt Long-term Lodging from the 9 Percent Sales Tax on Lodging

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Exempt Long-term Lodging from the 9 Percent Sales Tax on Lodging

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #175 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #65 (Y: 76 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-02SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2021-06-02SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 175 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2021-06-02SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
2021-06-02SenateReports READ
2021-05-19HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2021-05-19HouseROLL CALL NO. 65 (Yeas 76 - Nays 66 - Absent 9 - Excused 0)
2021-05-19HouseOn motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2021-05-19HouseReports READ.
2021-05-10JointReported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
2021-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
2021-03-29JointVoted: Divided Report
2021-03-29JointWork Session Held
2021-02-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
2021-02-25HouseReceived by the Clerk of the House on February 25, 2021.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback